MI HB5379 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/17/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/17/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; training and local policies concerning administration of opioid antagonists in public schools; provide for. Amends secs. 5 & 1178 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.5 & 380.1178) & adds sec. 1179b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5378'16
Title
Education; school districts; training and local policies concerning administration of opioid antagonists in public schools; provide for. Amends secs. 5 & 1178 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.5 & 380.1178) & adds sec. 1179b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5378'16
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/17/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-02-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Charles Brunner |
Same As/Similar To
SB0806 (Same As) 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0385'16
Subjects
Education: safety
Education: school districts
Health: emergency response
State agencies (existing): community health
State agencies (existing): education
State agencies (existing): human services
Education: school districts
Health: emergency response
State agencies (existing): community health
State agencies (existing): education
State agencies (existing): human services
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2016-HB-5379 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2016-HIB-5379.htm |