MI SB0797 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0539'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0539'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; nonnative species; instrumentality of violations; provide for forfeiture of. Amends sec. 4701 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.4701). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0795'14
Title
Natural resources; nonnative species; instrumentality of violations; provide for forfeiture of. Amends sec. 4701 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.4701). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0795'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 905 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 700 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 361 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 700 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 361 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0539'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 11:13 Am |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 3:44 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 10:50 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 905 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-17 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 700 Yeas 104 Nays 4 |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-06-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Received On 06/04/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 361 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |