MI SB0789 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 01/15/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 01/15/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; licensing; concealed pistol licensing boards; eliminate, and transfer duties to department of state police and county clerks. Amends secs. 1, 4, 5, 5a, 5b, 5c, 5d, 5e, 5f, 5j, 5k, 5l, 5m & 8 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 et seq.); adds sec. 5x & repeals sec. 6a of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.426a).
Title
Weapons; licensing; concealed pistol licensing boards; eliminate, and transfer duties to department of state police and county clerks. Amends secs. 1, 4, 5, 5a, 5b, 5c, 5d, 5e, 5f, 5j, 5k, 5l, 5m & 8 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 et seq.); adds sec. 5x & repeals sec. 6a of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.426a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 806 (Y: 84 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 942 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 407 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 942 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 407 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 01/15/2015 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:32 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-19 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 806 Yeas 84 Nays 26 |
2014-12-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-19 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2014-12-19 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2014-12-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 942 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2014-06-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-10 | House | Received On 06/10/2014 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 407 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Green |