MI SB0784 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - Assigned Pa 0103'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - Assigned Pa 0103'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: exemptions; disabled veteran exemption; replace with process to apply for an income tax credit. Amends sec. 7b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7b).
Title
Property tax: exemptions; disabled veteran exemption; replace with process to apply for an income tax credit. Amends sec. 7b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 266 (Y: 69 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 271 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 271 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0103'22 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/16/2022 03:00 Pm |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Became Law Without Governor's Signature |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/02/2022 11:30 Am |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-05-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-05-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 266 Yeas 69 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-19 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-05-19 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-05-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-19 | House | Received On 05/19/2022 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 271 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jon C. Bumstead |