MI SB0783 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax: property tax credit; replacement of disabled veterans property tax exemption with a property tax credit for disabled veterans; provide for. Amends secs. 516, 520 & 522 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.516 et seq.) & adds secs. 505 & 521. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1084'22
Title
Individual income tax: property tax credit; replacement of disabled veterans property tax exemption with a property tax credit for disabled veterans; provide for. Amends secs. 516, 520 & 522 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.516 et seq.) & adds secs. 505 & 521. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1084'22
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-12-07 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 487 Yeas 88 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 9 |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-12-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2022-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-11-30 | House | Received On 11/30/2022 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 505 Yeas 32 Nays 3 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jon C. Bumstead |
Subjects
Individual income tax: property tax credit
Local government: financing
Property tax: exemptions
State agencies (existing): treasury
Veterans: other
Local government: financing
Property tax: exemptions
State agencies (existing): treasury
Veterans: other