MI SB0776 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5313
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5313
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; department of state police; provide for fiscal year 2014-2015. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; department of state police; provide for fiscal year 2014-2015. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 293 (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 293 (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 253 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 204 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 293 (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 253 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 204 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5313 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee |
2014-05-20 | House | House Conferees Named 05/20/2014: Reps. Michael Mccready Nancy Jenkins Sean Mccann |
2014-05-20 | House | Senate Conferees Named 05/20/2014: Sens. Patrick Colbeck Roger Kahn Vincent Gregory |
2014-05-20 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute H-1 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/20/2014: Sens. Patrick Colbeck, Roger Kahn, Vincent Gregory |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Roll Call # 293 Yeas 0 Nays 37 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Nonconcurred In |
2014-05-20 | Senate | House Amended Title |
2014-05-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Title Amended |
2014-05-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 253 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-05-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-05-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-05-13 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-04-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-04-29 | House | Received On 04/29/2014 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 204 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Patrick Colbeck |