MI SB0772 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0439'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State financing and management; bonds; provision relating to purchase of qualified bonds of school district; modify. Amends sec. 7 of 1985 PA 227 (MCL 141.1057). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0770'11, SB 0771'11

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State financing and management; bonds; provision relating to purchase of qualified bonds of school district; modify. Amends sec. 7 of 1985 PA 227 (MCL 141.1057). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0770'11, SB 0771'11

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1067 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1078 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 825 (Y: 68 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 464 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0439'12
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 9:57 Am
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/22/2012 @ 10:26 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27SenatePresented To Governor 12/20/2012 @ 4:36 Pm
2012-12-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-14SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2012-12-14SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-14Senate Roll Call # 1067 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-14SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2012-12-14SenateHouse Amended Title
2012-12-13HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-13HouseTitle Amended
2012-12-13HousePassed Roll Call # 825 Yeas 68 Nays 41
2012-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-13HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2012-12-13HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2012-06-07HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2012-06-07HouseRead A First Time
2012-06-07HouseReceived On 06/07/2012
2012-06-07SenatePassed Roll Call # 464 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2012-06-06SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2012-06-06SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2012-06-06SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-05-17SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2012-05-17SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-05-17SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2011-10-20SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0772
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0772.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0772.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0772.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0772.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0439.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-05-17-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-06-07-057.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-05-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-14-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback