MI SB0771 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: other; operation of golf carts on streets and county roads in certain municipalities; allow. Amends sec. 657a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.657a).
Title
Vehicles: other; operation of golf carts on streets and county roads in certain municipalities; allow. Amends sec. 657a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.657a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 255 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2024-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-20 | House | Received On 06/20/2024 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 255 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |