MI SB0758 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; career and technical; obsolete act relating to the functions of the state board of control for vocational education; repeal. Repeals 1964 PA 28 (MCL 395.21).
Title
Education; career and technical; obsolete act relating to the functions of the state board of control for vocational education; repeal. Repeals 1964 PA 28 (MCL 395.21).
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. Marty Knollenberg [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. Phillip Pavlov [R] |
Sen. Dave Hildenbrand [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 212 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 212 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2016-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-04-28 | House | Received On 04/28/2016 |
2016-04-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 212 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Patrick Colbeck |