MI SB0753 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: supplemental; school aid act; provide for 2021-2022. Amends secs. 11, 17b, 201 & 236 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 et seq.).
Title
Appropriations: supplemental; school aid act; provide for 2021-2022. Amends secs. 11, 17b, 201 & 236 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 475 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-12-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-09 | House | Received On 12/09/2021 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 475 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |