MI SB0753 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0536'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0536'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; water pollution; local government liability for on-site wastewater treatment systems; provide exemption under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 3109 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3109).
Title
Environmental protection; water pollution; local government liability for on-site wastewater treatment systems; provide exemption under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 3109 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3109).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 725 (Y: 76 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 529 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 529 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0536'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 11:07 Am |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 3:54 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 10:10 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 725 Yeas 76 Nays 33 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-08-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-08-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-08-27 | House | Received On 08/13/2014 |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 529 Yeas 22 Nays 11 Excused 5 Not Voting 0 |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Bruce Caswell |
Subjects
Environmental protection, water pollution
Local government, liability
Local government, public services
State agencies (existing), environmental quality
Local government, liability
Local government, public services
State agencies (existing), environmental quality