MI SB0752 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 574'18 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 574'18 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; services or financial assistance; benefit eligibility after marriage; allow to extend for a certain period of time. Amends secs. 57, 57a & 57b of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.57 et seq.).
Title
Human services; services or financial assistance; benefit eligibility after marriage; allow to extend for a certain period of time. Amends secs. 57, 57a & 57b of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.57 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1052 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 944 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 125 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 944 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 125 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 574'18 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 3:38 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 12:19 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 1:30 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Roll Call # 1052 Yeas 34 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 944 Yeas 102 Nays 6 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-12-20 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2018-03-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-01 | House | Received On 03/01/2008 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 125 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families Seniors And Human Services |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |