MI SB0748 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; limousines; compliance with city vehicle for hire ordinance; revise population requirement, modify definition of limousine, and increase fine for a limo carrier of passengers that allows a driver or operator of a limousine to drive or operate a limousine in violation of limousine transportation act. Amends secs. 7 & 31 of 1990 PA 271 (MCL 257.1907 & 257.1931).
Title
Transportation; limousines; compliance with city vehicle for hire ordinance; revise population requirement, modify definition of limousine, and increase fine for a limo carrier of passengers that allows a driver or operator of a limousine to drive or operate a limousine in violation of limousine transportation act. Amends secs. 7 & 31 of 1990 PA 271 (MCL 257.1907 & 257.1931).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 426 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 426 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-11-13 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2014-11-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2014-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-12 | House | Received On 06/11/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Title Amended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 426 Yeas 30 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Adopted |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Virgil Smith |