MI SB0747 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0488'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0488'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; crimes against minors; crime of child care licensing rule violation resulting in death of a child; punish as second degree child abuse. Amends sec. 136b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.136b).
Title
Crimes; crimes against minors; crime of child care licensing rule violation resulting in death of a child; punish as second degree child abuse. Amends sec. 136b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.136b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 758 (Y: 74 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 135 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 135 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0488'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/6/2017 @ 1:20 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/5/2017 @ 12:09 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2016 @ 3:46 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-15 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-15 | House | Passed Roll Call # 758 Yeas 74 Nays 33 |
2016-12-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2016-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-23 | House | Received On 03/23/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 135 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |