MI SB0743 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-11 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-11 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; abduction; uniform child abduction prevention act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Children; abduction; uniform child abduction prevention act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 615 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2012-09-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-11 | House | Received On 09/11/2012 |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 615 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
Subjects
Children, abduction
Children, protection
Civil procedure, injunctions
Civil procedure, remedies
Family law, child custody
Family law, parenting time
Law, uniform or model acts
Children, protection
Civil procedure, injunctions
Civil procedure, remedies
Family law, child custody
Family law, parenting time
Law, uniform or model acts