MI SB0735 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 195'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 195'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; recording; death certificate for joint tenant; require to be recorded separately from deed. Amends sec. 48 of 1846 RS 65 (MCL 565.48).
Title
Property; recording; death certificate for joint tenant; require to be recorded separately from deed. Amends sec. 48 of 1846 RS 65 (MCL 565.48).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 357 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 354 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 74 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 354 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 74 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 195'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/20/2018 @ 1:20 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/19/2018 @ 8:08 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/8/2018 @ 9:53 Am |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Roll Call # 357 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-05-22 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 354 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Received On 02/14/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 74 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Knezek |