MI SB0714 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: shorelands; temporary erosion control structures; authorize without permit during high water levels. Amends secs. 32312, 32312a & 32510 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.32312 et seq.) & adds secs. 32312c & 32517.
Title
Natural resources: shorelands; temporary erosion control structures; authorize without permit during high water levels. Amends secs. 32312, 32312a & 32510 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.32312 et seq.) & adds secs. 32312c & 32517.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 32 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2020-01-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-30 | House | Received On 01/30/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 32 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Environmental Quality |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Roger Victory |
Subjects
Natural resources: Great Lakes
Natural resources: shorelands
Natural resources: soil and erosion
State agencies (existing): environment, Great Lakes, and energy
Natural resources: shorelands
Natural resources: soil and erosion
State agencies (existing): environment, Great Lakes, and energy