MI SB0711 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0077'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0077'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; lottery; lottery winners; require lottery bureau to share names with department of human services. Amends 1972 PA 239 (MCL 432.1 - 432.47) by adding sec. 32a.
Title
Gaming; lottery; lottery winners; require lottery bureau to share names with department of human services. Amends 1972 PA 239 (MCL 432.1 - 432.47) by adding sec. 32a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 106 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 106 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0077'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/11/2012 @ 3:38 Pm |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/11/2012 @ 10:15 Am |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/2/2012 @ 1:11 Pm |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-03-29 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-03-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2012-03-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-03-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2012-03-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-01 | House | Received On 03/01/2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 106 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 1 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
HB5032 (Same As) 2012-09-11 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services