MI SB0692 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Presented To Governor 6/14/2016 @ 12:08 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Presented To Governor 6/14/2016 @ 12:08 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health; code; reference to deaf and "hearing impaired"; revise to deaf, deafblind, and "hard of hearing". Amends sec. 939 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1939).
Title
Mental health; code; reference to deaf and "hearing impaired"; revise to deaf, deafblind, and "hard of hearing". Amends sec. 939 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1939).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 288 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 288 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/14/2016 @ 12:08 Pm |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0239'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/24/2016 @ 11:10 Am |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/23/2016 @ 2:26 Pm |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-06-02 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-06-02 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2016-06-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-06-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-06-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-05-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-05-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-17 | House | Received On 05/17/2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 288 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |