MI SB0689 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
Pending: House Michigan Competitiveness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
Pending: House Michigan Competitiveness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; county employees; retirement health benefits for charter county employees subject to the protecting local government retirement and benefits act; provide for. Amends secs. 14, 14a & 15 of 1966 PA 293 (MCL 45.514 et seq.) & adds sec. 15c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0686'17
Title
Retirement; county employees; retirement health benefits for charter county employees subject to the protecting local government retirement and benefits act; provide for. Amends secs. 14, 14a & 15 of 1966 PA 293 (MCL 45.514 et seq.) & adds sec. 15c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0686'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 492 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-12-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Received On 12/07/2017 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 492 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Shirkey |