MI SB0678 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 0272'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 0272'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation; tobacco; distribution of tobacco products tax revenue; modify. Amends sec. 12 of 1993 PA 327 (MCL 205.432).
Title
Taxation; tobacco; distribution of tobacco products tax revenue; modify. Amends sec. 12 of 1993 PA 327 (MCL 205.432).
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Kahn [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 515 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 515 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 431 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 206 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 515 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 431 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 206 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0272'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/2/2014 @ 11:27 Am |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/28/2014 @ 8:46 Am |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2014 @ 3:50 Pm |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 515 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 431 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2014-06-12 | House | Amended |
2014-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-11 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-06-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-04-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-04-30 | House | Received On 04/30/2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 206 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Adopted |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Roger Kahn |