MI SB0676 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Assigned Pa 0255'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Assigned Pa 0255'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: delinquent taxes; distribution of revenue from sale of foreclosure; modify. Amends sec. 78m of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78m). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1137'20
Title
Property tax: delinquent taxes; distribution of revenue from sale of foreclosure; modify. Amends sec. 78m of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78m). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1137'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 620 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 435 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 435 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0255'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2020 05:48 Pm |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/22/2020 04:40 Pm |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 12:08 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 620 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-16 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2020 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 435 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter J. Lucido |