MI SB0676 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; other; definition of gross receipts; replace with definition under former single business tax act. Amends sec. 607 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.607).
Title
Income tax; other; definition of gross receipts; replace with definition under former single business tax act. Amends sec. 607 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.607).
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB4938 (Same As) 2012-01-17 - Referred To Committee On Finance