MI SB0672 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0213'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0213'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; carriers; motor carrier safety act; remove exemption for certain motor buses. Amends sec. 5 of 1963 PA 181 (MCL 480.15).
Title
Transportation; carriers; motor carrier safety act; remove exemption for certain motor buses. Amends sec. 5 of 1963 PA 181 (MCL 480.15).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 3 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 3 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0213'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2018 @ 1:36 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/25/2018 @ 5:00 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/20/2018 @ 3:08 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-01-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-16 | House | Received On 01/16/2018 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 3 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |