MI SB0660 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0268'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Controlled substances; marihuana; sale of pharmaceutical-grade cannabis through licensed facilities; allow under certain circumstances and regulate the possession and use of pharmaceutical-grade cannabis by certain individuals. Amends secs. 1104, 7212, 7214, 7301a, 7303, 16169, 16170a, 16174, 16192, 16216, 16221, 16222, 16226, 16231, 16231a, 16232, 16233, 16237, 16241, 16245, 16315, 17754, 17768, 17775 & 20176a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1104 et seq.); adds art. 8 & repeals secs. 7335 & 7336 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7335 & 333.7336).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances; marihuana; sale of pharmaceutical-grade cannabis through licensed facilities; allow under certain circumstances and regulate the possession and use of pharmaceutical-grade cannabis by certain individuals. Amends secs. 1104, 7212, 7214, 7301a, 7303, 16169, 16170a, 16174, 16192, 16216, 16221, 16222, 16226, 16231, 16231a, 16232, 16233, 16237, 16241, 16245, 16315, 17754, 17768, 17775 & 20176a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1104 et seq.); adds art. 8 & repeals secs. 7335 & 7336 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7335 & 333.7336).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 667 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 667 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 517 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0268'13 With Immediate Effect
2013-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/30/2013 @ 9:11 Am
2013-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/20/2013 @ 10:34 Am
2013-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/18/2013 @ 2:34 Pm 2013 Addenda
2013-12-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2013-12-12SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2013-12-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2013-12-12Senate Roll Call # 667 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2013-12-12SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2013-12-12SenateHouse Amended Title
2013-12-12HouseReturned To Senate
2013-12-12HouseTitle Amended
2013-12-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 Yeas 87 Nays 22
2013-12-12HouseAmended
2013-12-12HouseRead A Third Time
2013-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2013-12-11HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2013-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2013-12-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2013-12-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2013-11-13HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2013-11-13HouseRead A First Time
2013-11-13HouseReceived On 11/13/2013
2013-11-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 517 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2013-11-13SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2013-11-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3
2013-11-07SenateSubstitute S-3 Concurred In
2013-11-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3
2013-11-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3
2013-11-07SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2013-11-07SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-3
2013-10-31SenateReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2013-10-31SenateIntroduced By Senator Roger Kahn

Same As/Similar To

HB5185 (Same As) 2013-12-11 - Printed Bill Filed 12/11/2013

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-SB-0660
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2013-SIB-0660.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2013-SEBS-0660.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2013-SEBH-0660.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2013-SNB-0660.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/publicact/htm/2013-PA-0268.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-11-07-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-11-13-095.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2013-HJ-12-10-104.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2013-HJ-12-12-106.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-12-12-102.htm

Bill Comments

feedback