MI SB0658 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; prohibition for certain schools from disclosing records to parents when disclosure is prohibited by a personal protection order; provide for. Amends sec. 1136 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1136). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0655'17
Title
Education; school districts; prohibition for certain schools from disclosing records to parents when disclosure is prohibited by a personal protection order; provide for. Amends sec. 1136 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1136). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0655'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 289 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-05-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Received On 05/15/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 289 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |
Subjects
Civil procedure: personal protection orders
Education: reports
Education: school districts
State agencies (existing): education
Education: reports
Education: school districts
State agencies (existing): education