MI SB0646 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: carriers; motor bus transportation act; modify the display of identification requirements. Amends sec. 15 of 1982 PA 432 (MCL 474.115).
Title
Transportation: carriers; motor bus transportation act; modify the display of identification requirements. Amends sec. 15 of 1982 PA 432 (MCL 474.115).
Sponsors
Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 317 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-09-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-22 | House | Received On 09/22/2020 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 317 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Erika Geiss |