MI SB0622 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0215'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0215'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of US-23; designate as the "Peter A. Pettalia Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 12b.
Title
Highways; name; portion of US-23; designate as the "Peter A. Pettalia Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 12b.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 541 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 345 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 345 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0215'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2018 @ 1:40 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/25/2018 @ 4:56 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/20/2018 @ 3:04 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 541 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Title Amended |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Received On 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 345 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |