MI SB0619 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0505'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0505'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; tax increment financing; tax capture districts; provide opt-in and opt-out provisions for certain entities. Amends secs. 1 & 3 of 1980 PA 450 (MCL 125.1801 & 125.1803).
Title
Economic development; tax increment financing; tax capture districts; provide opt-in and opt-out provisions for certain entities. Amends secs. 1 & 3 of 1980 PA 450 (MCL 125.1801 & 125.1803).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 832 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 713 (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 109 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 713 (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 109 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0505'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2017 @ 11:18 Am |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/5/2017 @ 2:50 Pm |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2016 @ 3:56 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Roll Call # 832 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-15 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 713 Yeas 70 Nays 38 |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-14 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2016-03-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-16 | House | Received On 03/16/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 109 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jack Brandenburg |