MI SB0618 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control: violations; definition for "vulnerable roadway user"; add. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 79g. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0617'23, HB 5223'23, HB 5224'23

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control: violations; definition for "vulnerable roadway user"; add. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 79g. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0617'23, HB 5223'23, HB 5224'23

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 237 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
2024-06-05HouseRead A First Time
2024-06-05HouseReceived On 06/05/2024
2024-06-05SenatePassed Roll Call # 237 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2024-06-05SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2024-05-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2024-05-22SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2024-05-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2024-05-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2024-05-09SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2023-10-25SenateReferred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
2023-10-25SenateIntroduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt

Same As/Similar To

SB0617 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
HB5223 (Same As) 2024-06-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
HB5224 (Same As) 2024-06-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-SB-0618
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2023-SIB-0618.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBS-0618.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0617-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0617-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0617-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0617-C.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-05-09-044.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-06-05-055.htm

Bill Comments

feedback