MI SB0616 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned Pa 0056'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned Pa 0056'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; access to electronic central registry; allow tribal entity or tribal social services representative to have access. Amends sec. 7 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.627).
Title
Children; protection; access to electronic central registry; allow tribal entity or tribal social services representative to have access. Amends sec. 7 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.627).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 472 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 472 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0056'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/6/2018 @ 3:56 Pm |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/6/2018 @ 11:26 Am |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 2/22/2018 @ 2:19 Pm |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-02-07 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2018-02-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-30 | House | Received On 11/30/2017 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 472 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Judith Emmons |