MI SB0612 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Assigned Pa 0136'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Assigned Pa 0136'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; barbers; hours of education requirement; revise. Amends sec. 1108 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1108). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5396'14
Title
Occupations; barbers; hours of education requirement; revise. Amends sec. 1108 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1108). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5396'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 273 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 541 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 541 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0136'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/27/2014 @ 2:45 Pm |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/27/2014 @ 11:20 Am |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/22/2014 @ 1:06 Pm |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-05-15 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 273 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2014-05-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-05-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2014-05-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-13 | House | Amended |
2014-05-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2013-11-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-11-14 | House | Received On 11/14/2013 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 541 Yeas 31 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Hoon-yung Hopgood |