MI SB0602 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: real estate; right-to-list home sale agreement; require certain provisions of a valid agreement. Amends secs. 2501 & 2512 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.2501 & 339.2512) & adds sec. 2512g.
Title
Occupations: real estate; right-to-list home sale agreement; require certain provisions of a valid agreement. Amends secs. 2501 & 2512 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.2501 & 339.2512) & adds sec. 2512g.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 29 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2024-02-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-02-27 | House | Received On 02/27/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 29 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |