MI SB0593 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0338'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0338'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; foster care; consideration within foster care system for minors who may be victims of human trafficking; allow. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 4e.
Title
Children; foster care; consideration within foster care system for minors who may be victims of human trafficking; allow. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 4e.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 628 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 628 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 513 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 145 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 628 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 513 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 145 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0338'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/16/2014 @ 3:53 Pm |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/15/2014 @ 11:08 Am |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/7/2014 @ 3:40 Pm |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Roll Call # 628 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-02 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-10-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-10-01 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-10-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 513 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-05 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-06-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-03-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-26 | House | Received On 03/26/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 145 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
Children, children's rights
Children, foster care
Crime victims, other
State agencies (existing), human services
Children, foster care
Crime victims, other
State agencies (existing), human services