MI SB0578 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Controlled substances: opioids; distribution of opioid antagonists by community-based organizations under a standing order; allow. Amends sec. 17744e of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17744e).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances: opioids; distribution of opioid antagonists by community-based organizations under a standing order; allow. Amends sec. 17744e of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17744e).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 383 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2021-10-14HouseRead A First Time
2021-10-14HouseReceived On 10/14/2021
2021-10-14SenatePassed Roll Call # 383 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-10-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-10-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-10-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-10-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-10-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-06-30SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2021-06-30SenateIntroduced By Senator Winnie Brinks

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback