MI SB0575 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0238'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0238'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; motorcycles; increase of motorcycle endorsement fee and earmark of motorcycle registration fees into motorcycle safety fund; modify date of implementation. Amends secs. 312c & 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.312c & 257.801).
Title
Vehicles; motorcycles; increase of motorcycle endorsement fee and earmark of motorcycle registration fees into motorcycle safety fund; modify date of implementation. Amends secs. 312c & 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.312c & 257.801).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 501 (Y: 89 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 471 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 471 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0238'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2017 @ 2:02 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/20/2017 @ 12:58 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2017 @ 3:40 Pm |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 501 Yeas 89 Nays 21 |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-30 | House | Received On 11/30/2017 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 471 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |