MI SB0559 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-05 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-05 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; marriage and divorce; requirement that judgment of divorce contain provisions regarding wife's dower rights; eliminate. Amends sec. 1 of 1909 PA 259 (MCL 552.101).
Title
Family law; marriage and divorce; requirement that judgment of divorce contain provisions regarding wife's dower rights; eliminate. Amends sec. 1 of 1909 PA 259 (MCL 552.101).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 495 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-11-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-11-05 | House | Received On 11/05/2015 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 495 Yeas 34 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |