MI SB0545 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; other; enhanced Michigan education savings program website; create, and designate eligible services. Amends 2000 PA 161 (MCL 390.1471 - 390.1486) by adding secs. 21 & 22. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0544'17
Title
Individual income tax; other; enhanced Michigan education savings program website; create, and designate eligible services. Amends 2000 PA 161 (MCL 390.1471 - 390.1486) by adding secs. 21 & 22. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0544'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 475 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 475 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2017-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-05 | House | Received On 12/05/2017 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 475 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |
Subjects
Education: other
Education: special
Higher education: financial aid
Individual income tax: other
State agencies (existing): treasury
Education: special
Higher education: financial aid
Individual income tax: other
State agencies (existing): treasury