MI SB0543 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Pa 0019'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Pa 0019'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of I-94 in Kalamazoo County; designate as the "Chief Ed Switalski Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 19a.
Title
Highways; name; portion of I-94 in Kalamazoo County; designate as the "Chief Ed Switalski Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 19a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 42 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 441 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 441 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0019'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/14/2018 @ 1:44 Pm |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Approved By Governor 2/14/2018 @ 12:28 Pm |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Presented To Governor 2/6/2018 @ 2:06 Pm |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-01-31 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 42 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-11-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-02 | House | Received On 11/02/2017 |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 441 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |