MI SB0525 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Pa 06'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Pa 06'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; reorganization; reorganization of courts and number of judgeships; modify. Amends secs. 511, 530, 545, 821, 8121, 8121a, 8122, 8123 & 8124 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.511 et seq.).
Title
Courts; reorganization; reorganization of courts and number of judgeships; modify. Amends secs. 511, 530, 545, 821, 8121, 8121a, 8122, 8123 & 8124 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.511 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 2 (Y: 63 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 439 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-09-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 2 (Y: 63 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 439 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-09-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 06'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/26/2018 @ 2:06 Pm |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/26/2018 @ 1:14 Pm |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/24/2018 @ 9:20 Am |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Roll Call # 1 Yeas 32 Nays 2 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-01-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-01-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 2 Yeas 63 Nays 43 |
2018-01-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-01-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-02 | House | Received On 11/02/2017 |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Title Amended |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 439 Yeas 33 Nays 2 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |