MI SB0518 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: teachers and administrators; interim teaching certification process; modify. Amends sec. 1531i of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1531i).
Title
Education: teachers and administrators; interim teaching certification process; modify. Amends sec. 1531i of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1531i).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 578 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 578 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2023-10-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-24 | House | Received On 10/20/2023 |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 578 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri |