MI SB0518 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; funds; allocation of federal aid funding to department of transportation; provide for. Amends sec. 10o of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.660o). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0519'19
Title
Transportation; funds; allocation of federal aid funding to department of transportation; provide for. Amends sec. 10o of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.660o). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0519'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 25 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Received On 01/28/2020 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 25 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Runestad |