MI SB0498 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; other; procedures for actions under sections 25 to 32 of article IX of the state constitution; revise. Amends sec. 308a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.308a) & adds secs. 308b, 308c, 308d, 308e, 308f & 308g. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0495'13
Title
Civil procedure; other; procedures for actions under sections 25 to 32 of article IX of the state constitution; revise. Amends sec. 308a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.308a) & adds secs. 308b, 308c, 308d, 308e, 308f & 308g. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0495'13
Sponsors
Sen. David Robertson [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. Judith Emmons [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-09-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2013-09-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Robertson |
Same As/Similar To
HB5505 (Same As) 2014-05-01 - Printed Bill Filed 05/01/2014