MI SB0477 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Assigned Pa 0349'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control; traffic regulation; vehicles to move over and slow down when passing certain stationary vehicles; require, and modify penalties. Amends secs. 320a, 653a & 653b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.320a et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control; traffic regulation; vehicles to move over and slow down when passing certain stationary vehicles; require, and modify penalties. Amends secs. 320a, 653a & 653b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.320a et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 587 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 579 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 488 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-27SenateAssigned Pa 0349'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-11-27SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/15/2018 @ 1:38 Pm
2018-11-27SenateApproved By Governor 11/15/2018 @ 10:25 Am
2018-11-27SenatePresented To Governor 11/13/2018 @ 3:52 Pm
2018-11-08SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-11-08SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-11-08SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-11-08Senate Roll Call # 587 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2018-11-08SenateHouse Substitute H-5 Concurred In
2018-09-26HouseReturned To Senate
2018-09-26HouseTitle Amended
2018-09-26HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 579 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2018-09-26HouseRead A Third Time
2018-09-26HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-09-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-09-26HouseAmended
2018-09-26HouseAmendment(s) Not Adopted
2018-09-26HouseAmendment(s) Reconsidered
2018-09-26HouseMotion To Reconsider Amendment
2018-09-26HouseMotion To Refer To Third Reading Reconsidered
2018-09-25HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-09-25HouseSubstitute H-5 Adopted And Amended
2018-09-25HouseSubstitute H-2 Not Adopted
2018-09-25HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-22HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-22HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2017-12-06HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2017-12-06HouseRead A First Time
2017-12-06HouseReceived On 12/06/2017
2017-12-06SenatePassed Roll Call # 488 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-12-06SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-12-06SenateRules Suspended
2017-12-06SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2017-12-06SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2017-12-06SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2017-12-05SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2017-12-05SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-12-05SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2017-06-21SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation
2017-06-21SenateIntroduced By Senator Dale Zorn

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0477
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0477.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0477.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0477.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0477.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0349.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-05-098.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-06-099.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-22-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-09-26-064.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-11-08-070.htm

Bill Comments

feedback