MI SB0470 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0344'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0344'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; retail sales; tagging of certain beer kegs; require. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 1030.
Title
Liquor; retail sales; tagging of certain beer kegs; require. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 1030.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0344'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2010 @ 4:06 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/21/2010 @ 12:17 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/17/2010 @ 2:30 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | Roll Call # 686 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-15 | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In | |
2010-12-15 | House Amended Title | |
2010-12-15 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-15 | Title Amended | |
2010-12-15 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 606 Yeas 55 Nays 39 | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-15 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-06-25 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | |
2009-06-25 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-25 | Received On 06/25/2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Passed Roll Call # 366 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-17 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-17 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-06-17 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-09 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-09 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-06-09 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-04-28 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
HB4565 (Same As) 2009-11-12 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1