MI SB0468 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0177'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0177'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; arrests; complainant's signature requirement to file a criminal complaint in cases alleging vulnerable adult abuse; prohibit magistrate from refusing to accept complaint because signed upon information and belief by individual other than the victim. Amends sec. 1a, ch. IV of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 764.1a).
Title
Criminal procedure; arrests; complainant's signature requirement to file a criminal complaint in cases alleging vulnerable adult abuse; prohibit magistrate from refusing to accept complaint because signed upon information and belief by individual other than the victim. Amends sec. 1a, ch. IV of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 764.1a).
Sponsors
Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Dave Hildenbrand [R] | Sen. Judith Emmons [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 624 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-10-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 624 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-10-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0177'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/19/2012 @ 3:11 Pm |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/19/2012 @ 12:22 Pm |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/7/2012 @ 2:41 Pm |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2012-05-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-11-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2011-11-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-02 | House | Received On 11/02/2011 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 624 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |