MI SB0465 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0367'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Liens; construction; architects, engineers, and surveyors; allow to have a lien on recording a notice, without an actual physical improvement. Amends secs. 104, 106, 108, 108a, 109, 112 & 119 of 1980 PA 497 (MCL 570.1104 et seq.) & adds secs. 107a & 107b & repeals sec. 301 of 1980 PA 497 (MCL 570.1301).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liens; construction; architects, engineers, and surveyors; allow to have a lien on recording a notice, without an actual physical improvement. Amends secs. 104, 106, 108, 108a, 109, 112 & 119 of 1980 PA 497 (MCL 570.1104 et seq.) & adds secs. 107a & 107b & repeals sec. 301 of 1980 PA 497 (MCL 570.1301).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 619 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 643 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 324 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13SenateAssigned Pa 0367'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-13SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/12/2018 @ 4:38 Pm
2018-12-13SenateApproved By Governor 12/12/2018 @ 12:22 Pm
2018-12-06SenatePresented To Governor 12/5/2018 @ 9:42 Am
2018-11-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-11-29SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-11-29SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-11-29Senate Roll Call # 619 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-11-29SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2018-11-28HouseReturned To Senate
2018-11-28HouseInserted Full Title
2018-11-28HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 643 Yeas 105 Nays 4
2018-11-28HouseRead A Third Time
2018-11-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-11-27HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-11-27HouseRead A Second Time
2018-09-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-09-26HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-05-22HouseReferred To Committee On Financial Services
2018-05-22HouseRead A First Time
2018-05-22HouseReceived On 05/22/2018
2018-05-22SenatePassed Roll Call # 324 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-05-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2018-05-17SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2018-05-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2018-05-03SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2018-05-03SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-03SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2017-06-15SenateReferred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions
2017-06-15SenateIntroduced By Senator Darwin Booher

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0465
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0465.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0465.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0465.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0465.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0367.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-03-044.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-22-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-09-26-064.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-11-28-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-11-29-073.htm

Bill Comments

feedback