MI SB0459 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0219'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0219'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of M-52; designate as the "Trooper Calvin R. Jones Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 20a.
Title
Highways; name; portion of M-52; designate as the "Trooper Calvin R. Jones Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 20a.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 476 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 68 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 68 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0219'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2018 @ 1:48 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/25/2018 @ 4:58 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/20/2018 @ 3:06 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 476 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-02-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-13 | House | Received On 02/13/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 68 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |