MI SB0450 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-27 - Assigned Pa 0150'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-27 - Assigned Pa 0150'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; hazardous waste; waste reduction fund; revise distribution of money. Amends sec. 11108 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11108).
Title
Environmental protection; hazardous waste; waste reduction fund; revise distribution of money. Amends sec. 11108 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11108).
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Kahn [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 315 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 350 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 350 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0150'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/21/2011 @ 2:26 Pm |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 9/20/2011 @ 3:38 Pm |
2011-09-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 9/13/2011 @ 2:36 Pm |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-09-07 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-08-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-08-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-08-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 315 Yeas 63 Nays 44 |
2011-08-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-08-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-08-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-08-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-08-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-08-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2011-06-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-23 | House | Received On 06/23/2011 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 350 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB4737 (Same As) 2011-06-15 - Printed Bill Filed 06/15/2011
Subjects
Environmental protection, air pollution
Environmental protection, hazardous waste
State agencies (existing), natural resources
Environmental protection, hazardous waste
State agencies (existing), natural resources