MI SB0435 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions; savings banks; access to cash benefits from certain automatic teller machines (ATMs) with bridge card; prohibit. Amends 1996 PA 354 (MCL 487.3101 - 487.3804) by adding sec. 436.
Title
Financial institutions; savings banks; access to cash benefits from certain automatic teller machines (ATMs) with bridge card; prohibit. Amends 1996 PA 354 (MCL 487.3101 - 487.3804) by adding sec. 436.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. David Robertson [R] |
Sen. Glenn Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-10-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 433 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2013-10-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-22 | House | Received On 10/22/2013 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 433 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Same As/Similar To
HB4859 (Same As) 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 196'13 With Immediate Effect 2013 Addenda
Subjects
Financial institutions, savings banks
Human services, services or financial assistance
State agencies (existing), human services
Human services, services or financial assistance
State agencies (existing), human services